Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne de Brito, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹Born
1603²36.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
11 Jan 162154.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
11 Jan 162154.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
18 Feb 162457.1SucceededArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
29 Sep 162457.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
2 Dec 164174.9DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne de Brito
Archbishop Etienne de Brito S.J. (born 1567, died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstremoz

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302, and Page 167
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast