Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis de Brito de Menezes, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570²Born
18 May 161545.3AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
1 Jan 161747.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
27 May 162757.4AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
29 Jul 162959.5DiedBishop of Cochin, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis de Brito de Menezes
Bishop Luis de Brito de Menezes O.S.A. (born 1570, died ) Bishop of Cochin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a bishop for 12.5 years

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,213
  • b/c2?3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018