Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Sandri-Trotti

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
20 Dec 162745.9AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
6 Feb 162846.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
5 Nov 164664.8DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Sandri-Trotti
Bishop Federico Sandri-Trotti (born 1582, died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossano, Diocese of Fossano
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,627, Number 43
  • ob/c2: AT, 18 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,071

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast