Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giusto (Juste) Guérin, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornTramoyes
28 Mar 163961.2AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
5 Jun 163961.4Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
3 Nov 164567.8DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giusto (Juste) Guérin:
Bishop Giusto (Juste) Guérin B. (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015