Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Sandi

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1704BornVenezia
21 Sep 172622.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Oct 172723.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 174743.3AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
21 Dec 174743.3Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
24 May 175651.7AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
12 Aug 178581.0DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Sandi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Sandi (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120, and Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015