Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolò Rossetti

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1734³Born
1 Nov 175722.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 177439.5AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
3 Jul 177439.5Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
25 Jan 181984.1DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolò Rossetti
Bishop Nicolò Rossetti (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArienzo

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125, and Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,774, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast