Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Rosales Encio

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornMiranda de Ebro
10 Mar 164160.2SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
12 Aug 164160.6ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
22 Dec 164161.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
31 Mar 164261.2DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rosales Encio:
Bishop Pedro Rosales Encio (died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 170, Number 1,064

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014