Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthaeus de Robertis

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1663BornGiffoni, Italy
1 May 172057.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172966.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
7 Aug 172966.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
2 Sep 173370.4DiedTitular Bishop of Callinicum

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Matthaeus de Robertis:
Bishop Matthaeus de Robertis (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Callinicum

  • a priest for 13.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015