Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carolus Polodig, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne)

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus

Titular See: (David a Sancto Carolo Boromeo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1671BornSvitavy
23 Dec 171342.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
23 Dec 171342.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
28 Jan 171442.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
7 Jul 171442.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Carolus Polodig:
Archbishop Carolus Polodig O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015