Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giacomo Pichi

Deceased

Bishop of Città Ducale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1663Born
10 Jan 170036.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 171854.8AppointedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
16 Jan 171854.8Ordained BishopBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
Mar 1733³69.9DiedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giacomo Pichi
Bishop Pietro Giacomo Pichi (born , died Mar 1733) Bishop of Città Ducale

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,732
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160, and Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,718, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast