Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldrago Antonio de Piccardi

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1708³BornTrieste
19 Mar 173122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trieste, Italy
12 Apr 173122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste, Italy
1 Jul 176658.1SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
1 Dec 176658.5ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
22 Feb 176758.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
31 Aug 178476.3SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
14 Feb 178576.7ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
13 Sep 178981.3DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aldrago Antonio de Piccardi:
Bishop Aldrago Antonio de Piccardi (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 334, and Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015