Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Pes y Polo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1661³BornSan Pedro, Spain
29 Sep 168726.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
5 Oct 168726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
20 Sep 172867.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
14 Nov 172867.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Pes y Polo:
Bishop Juan Bautista Pes y Polo O. Carm. (born ) Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 46, Number 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015