Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Maria Pandolfini

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1675BornLari
10 Apr 170024.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 171640.3AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
8 Mar 171640.4Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
18 May 174670.6DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Maria Pandolfini:
Bishop Lodovico Maria Pandolfini (died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013