Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Maria Panciatichi

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1660BornFlorence
17 Dec 170343.0AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
May 171655.4DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Maria Panciatichi:
Bishop Orazio Maria Panciatichi (born ) Bishop of Fiesole

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013