Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Pacella (Pacelli)

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1630BornBalvano
17 Aug 166433.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 167443.9AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
7 Oct 167443.9Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
31 Dec 170272.1DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Pacella (Pacelli):
Bishop Alfonso Pacella (Pacelli) (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015