Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Oliva, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornSiena
22 Nov 167760.8AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
30 Nov 167760.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
13 Mar 168467.1DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Oliva:
Bishop Nicola Oliva O.S.A. (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174
  • bp/d/c34: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015