Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis Ephrem Naccàsché

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1856BornMossul
1903²46.9AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
5 Apr 190347.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
13 Mar 192064.1DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Ephrem Naccàsché:
Archbishop Denis Ephrem Naccàsché (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013