Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonfiglio Mura, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1810Born
20 Aug 182616.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
3 Mar 183322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
28 Feb 187968.5AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
20 Apr 187968.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
18 Jul 188271.9DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonfiglio Mura (VIAF: 77775599)
Archbishop Bonfiglio Mura O.S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuglieri
Ordained BishopCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1879, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017