Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Miraballi (Miroballi), C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornNapoli
27 Nov 167950.9AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
30 Nov 167950.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
8 Sep 168152.6DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Miraballi (Miroballi):
Archbishop Gaetano Miraballi (Miroballi) C.R. (born 1629, died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 80
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015