Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Mattei, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1657³BornDasa
21 Sep 168023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
10 Jan 171860.5AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
16 Jan 171860.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
25 Jan 172567.5DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Mattei:
Bishop Gennaro Mattei O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 289
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015