Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Marioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
18 Apr 164456.2AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
3 May 164456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1659¹71.0ResignedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
11 Aug 166274.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Marioni (VIAF: 89299432)
Bishop Pietro Marioni (born 1588, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio
Ordained BishopGes¨, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 333
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1644, Number 24
  • ob/c2: AT, 13 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018