Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Maiz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

Titular Bishop of Rhithymna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1782Born
15 Mar 180825.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 180825.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 184462.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
25 Jul 184462.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
31 Aug 184563.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
15 May 184866.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Maiz
Bishop Marco Antonio Maiz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArroyos y Esteros

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 322
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,845, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast