Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Callisto Lodigeri, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1643BornViterbo
19 Jun 166623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
11 Apr 170764.0AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
1 May 170764.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
4 Mar 171066.9DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Callisto Lodigeri:
Bishop Callisto Lodigeri O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,415
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015