Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György Lippay Zombori

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornPosson
6 Jun 163332.4AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
21 Dec 163332.9Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
1637²36.0AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
4 Dec 164544.9AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
3 Jan 166665.0DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Lippay Zombori:
Archbishop György Lippay Zombori (died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 366, and Page 377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 382
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015