Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petar Petretić

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1648SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
1 Feb 1649ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
Sep 1666³SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Aug 1667ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
12 Oct 1667DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petar Petretić:
Archbishop Petar Petretić (died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015