Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Hoffmann

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹BornSzúletett
17 Dec 163925.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 165541.5AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Jan 165642.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
24 Jun 165945.4DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pál Hoffmann:
Bishop Pál Hoffmann (died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 290
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015