Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel-Bertrand de Langle

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1701BornRennes
24 Aug 173836.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
26 Jan 173937.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
5 Apr 173937.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
25 Jun 177472.7DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for Daniel-Bertrand de Langle:
Bishop Daniel-Bertrand de Langle (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015