Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Florian (Florijan) Hrebnicki (Hrebnyckyj)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Dec 1715AppointedAdministrator of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Russian Federation
1716¹AppointedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Russian Federation
14 Mar 1716Ordained BishopArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Russian Federation
1746²AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
8 Jun 1747SelectedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Dec 1748ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
18 Jul 1762DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Florian (Florijan) Hrebnicki (Hrebnyckyj):
Archbishop Florian (Florijan) Hrebnicki (Hrebnyckyj) (died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,028
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 253, and Page 284
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 14,756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015