Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mansour Hobeika

Deceased

Bishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1941Born
9 Jun 196826.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 200260.7AppointedBishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon
26 Oct 200260.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Oct 201472.8DiedBishop of Zahleh (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Mansour Hobeika
Bishop Mansour Hobeika (born , died ) Bishop of Zahleh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHadeth-Baalbek (Béqaa)

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,278
  • d: CB, 28 Oct 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018