Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grégoire Haddad

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Adana dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1924Born
23 Apr 194924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
30 Jul 196540.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
30 Jul 196540.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
5 Sep 196540.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
9 Sep 196843.9AppointedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
19 Aug 197550.9ResignedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
19 Aug 197550.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana dei Greco-Melkiti
23 Dec 201591.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Haddad
Archbishop Grégoire Haddad (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouk-el-Gharb

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Dec 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • opd: CB, 17 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017