Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Tiberius Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1611BornCremona
28 Dec 163928.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 167159.8AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
1 Mar 167159.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
1673²61.7DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Tiberius Gonzaga:
Bishop Ferdinando Tiberius Gonzaga (born ) Bishop of Mantova

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015