Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Basilio Ghetaldo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647¹BornRagusa
19 Jul 169447.5AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
25 Jul 169447.5Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
12 Sep 170255.6DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Basilio Ghetaldo:
Bishop Alfonso Basilio Ghetaldo O.S.B. (born 1647, died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 27
  • c34: CB, 26 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015