Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Feliú y Centena

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1728³BornGuardia de Arés, Spain
30 Mar 178960.4AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
16 Aug 178960.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
25 Jun 179162.7DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Feliú y Centena
Bishop Antonio Feliú y Centena (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,840
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 107, Number 554
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016