Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barnaba Giovanni Battista Fedele, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ispahan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1663BornMilano
17 Aug 169229.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 169229.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 170037.1ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Jun 171653.0AppointedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
9 Jul 171855.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan, Iran
8 Jan 173167.6DiedBishop of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Barnaba Giovanni Battista Fedele:
Bishop Barnaba Giovanni Battista Fedele O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Ispahan

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015