Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso del Tufo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1695BornTufo
8 Feb 173034.1AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
12 Feb 173034.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
7 May 174852.4ResignedBishop of Gerace, Italy
17 Jun 175458.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso del Tufo:
Bishop Ildefonso del Tufo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219
  • d/c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015