Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele de Marchis

Deceased

Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1662BornTerra di Lugri
168724.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 171855.4AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
16 Jan 171855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
Oct 173472.1DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele de Marchis:
Bishop Gabriele de Marchis (born ) Bishop of Sora

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013