Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme de La Mothe-Houdancourt

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
1 May 166447.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
23 Jun 166447.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
17 Aug 166447.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
29 May 169376.4DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme de La Mothe-Houdancourt
Bishop Jérôme de La Mothe-Houdancourt (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellovacen

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018