Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco del Tufo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1726Born
16 Jul 174216.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
25 Jul 176034.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
12 Jul 177953.0AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
18 Jul 177953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
15 Jun 180376.9DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco del Tufo (VIAF: 88779294)
Bishop Francesco del Tufo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatino

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast