Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop António Pedro da Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Damão, India

Titular Archbishop of Cranganore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1840Born
23 Dec 186525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Mar 188746.4AppointedBishop of Damão, India
14 Mar 188746.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cranganore
17 Apr 188746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Damão, India
30 Jan 190059.2DiedBishop of Damão, India

MicroData Summary for António Pedro da Costa (VIAF: 173791509)
Archbishop António Pedro da Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantarém, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto, Diocese of Porto, Portugal

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 238
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017