Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Castracane De’ Castracani

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1623³BornSenigallia
5 May 166036.9AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
9 May 166036.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
17 Oct 166946.4DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Castracane De’ Castracani:
Bishop Castracane De’ Castracani (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 129
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015