Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonsus del Balzo

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1667Born
9 Dec 169124.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 170335.8AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
21 Jan 170335.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
Sep 1705³38.4DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus del Balzo
Bishop Alphonsus del Balzo (born , died Sep 1705) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopSan Nicola de Cesarini, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 13.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 30
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast