Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Maria Danza

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1684³BornTramutola
22 Sep 170823.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 173348.4AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
8 Mar 173348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
1740¹55.2DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Maria Danza:
Bishop Gennaro Maria Danza (born , died 1740) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1733, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015