Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wolfgang Kämmerer von Dalberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538Born
20 Apr 158244.3SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Sep 158244.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
158345.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 158446.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Apr 160163.2DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Kämmerer von Dalberg (VIAF: 8128723)
Archbishop Wolfgang Kämmerer von Dalberg (born 1538, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAschaffenburg

  • a priest for 18.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,890
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,584, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast