Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Schönenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
16 Jan 158151.0AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
12 Apr 158353.2Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
11 Aug 159565.6DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg von Schönenberg (VIAF: 36803050)
Bishop Georg von Schönenberg (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Gangolf, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 372
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 5
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,067

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast