Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Elgard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538Born
156325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
3 Jun 157739.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Jun 157739.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
2 Feb 157840.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
11 Aug 158749.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Elgard (VIAF: 5722182)
Bishop Nikolaus Elgard (born 1538, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArlon

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018