Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Caravita

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1650BornNapoli
15 Dec 170454.3AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
28 Dec 170454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
24 Sep 171363.1DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Caravita:
Bishop Camillo Caravita (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014