Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustache de Chery

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nevers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1592Born
26 Sep 163340.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nevers, France
26 Sep 163340.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
May 1634³41.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
17 Jun 164350.5SucceededBishop of Nevers, France
26 Sep 166673.8ResignedBishop of Nevers, France
10 Nov 166976.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Eustache de Chery
Bishop Eustache de Chery (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRigny-Nolay

  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279, and Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,634, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast