Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio (Gaetano Gerardo) Cerati, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1730BornParma
3 Dec 175222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jul 178353.4AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
10 Aug 178353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
17 Feb 180777.0DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio (Gaetano Gerardo) Cerati:
Bishop Gregorio (Gaetano Gerardo) Cerati O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,498
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,021
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016