Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gasparo Cardinal Cavalieri

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648BornRome
2 Sep 168638.7Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168638.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
27 Oct 168638.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 168638.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 168739.5AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
9 Nov 168739.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
17 May 168840.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
28 Nov 168941.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
17 Aug 169042.6DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gasparo Cavalieri:
Cardinal Gasparo Cavalieri (died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 3.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013