Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Natale Caridei

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1599Born
23 Mar 165454.3AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
31 May 165454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
Apr 1676³76.3DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Natale Caridei
Bishop Natale Caridei (born , died Apr 1676) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained Bishopcouvent Sant’Agostino, Church, Mondolfo, Diocese of Senigallia, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 38
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Jan 2017